+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2020
- Ch. SL 2020-31
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/12/2020
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2020
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 10, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 120
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor