+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2017
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, State and Local Government II
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 15A
- 153A
- 160A
- 153A-145.5
- 15A-312
- 160A-205.2
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
April 27, 2017: M12 Suspend Rules Second Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 5
April 27, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5