+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On December 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 12/12/2018
- Withdrawn From Cal
On December 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 12/11/2018
- Withdrawn From Cal
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 12/10/2018
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A3
- Reconsidered 2nd Reading
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Failed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Adopted A1
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- No affected General Statutes
- 69-25.7
+ − Votes (5)
December 12, 2018: Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 18
December 6, 2018: A3 Dollar Second Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 17
December 6, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 17
December 5, 2018: A2 Holley Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 58
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 11
December 5, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor