+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message sent to the Senate
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/03/2014
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 150B -
- 150B-21.3A -
+ − Vote
June 3, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor