+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2014-16
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2014
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2014
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message sent to the Senate
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/29/2014
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
May 29, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3