+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/17/2013
- Ch. SL 2013-267
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2013
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Held in Senate Clerk's Office
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 143
- 143-133.1
- 143-133.5
+ − Votes (2)
July 2, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
April 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor