+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Postponed To 06/10/2014
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/05/2014
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
June 10, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor