+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Health Care
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A4
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Health
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Appropriations
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 130A-236
- 7B-1501
- 7B-302
- 143B-1385
- 113
- 130A
- 113-136
- 115C-521
- 120-19
- 120-3.1
- 130A-280
- 130A-281
- 130A-282
- 133.1
+ − Votes (6)
June 30, 2016: A4 Hager Third Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
June 30, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Absent: 7
June 28, 2016: A1 Bryan Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
June 28, 2016: A2 Brawley Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
June 28, 2016: A3 Millis Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 5
June 28, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 5