+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/22/2019
- Ch. SL 2019-149
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/03/2019
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Education - K-12
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
July 10, 2019: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 119
- Absent: 1
July 9, 2019: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2