+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message sent to the Senate
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2014
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 115C -
- 115C-12 -
- 115C-174.11 -
- 115C-401.2 -
- 115C-47 -
- 115C-83.30 -
- 138-5 -
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2014: A1 Holloway Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor