+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2016-43
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Local Government
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Elections
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
June 27, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor