+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 1, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2022-40
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 9, 2022 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2022: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 12
June 9, 2022: Third Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 25
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor