+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
- Ch. SL 2018-35
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2018
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On June 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Finance
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2018: Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
June 13, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor