+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law
- Reptd Fav
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- C-III-2
+ − Votes (4)
April 25, 2017: M12/Add Cal Second Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: A1 Jones, Bert Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 34
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor