+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Health Care
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Amend Failed A5
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Failed A4
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Amend Failed A1
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/15/2016
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2016
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Health
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Environment
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 18C
- 108A
- 108A-52
- 108A-52.1
- 108A-52.2
- 18C-114
- 18C-176
+ − Votes (8)
June 16, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
June 16, 2016: A5 Insko Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
June 15, 2016: A3 Farmer-Butterfield Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
June 15, 2016: A4 Farmer-Butterfield Second Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 74
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
June 15, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
June 15, 2016: M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
June 15, 2016: A2 Jones Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
June 14, 2016: A1 Queen Second Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 74
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor