+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2018
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary III
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor