+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Reconsidered 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Ruled Material
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Finance
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/08/2016
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Finance
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 105-164.4
- 153A-155
- 160A-215
- 153A
- 160A
+ − Votes (9)
July 1, 2016: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 7
June 28, 2016: M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 27, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 1
June 27, 2016: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
June 24, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
June 16, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 4
June 9, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
June 8, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4