+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
On June 4, 2018 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A3
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 1, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2018
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2018: Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 4, 2018: A3 Goodman Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9