+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/30/2014
- Ch. SL 2014-89
On July 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/22/2014
On July 21, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2014
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Ruled Material
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2014
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 153A-210.1
- 153A-210.2
- 153A
+ − Votes (5)
July 17, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 6
July 16, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
June 30, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
June 26, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 19, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2