+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2016-48
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Finance Added
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 160A-58.1
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
June 27, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 14, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 8
June 13, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8