+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-82
- Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Added to Calendar
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav As Amended, Unengrossed
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 113
- 113-270.1D
- 113-270.3
- 113-272.3
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2018: M11 Concur Sen. Com. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 26
June 15, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor