+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Finance Added
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 142
- 142-82
- 142-89
- 142-97