+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/06/2016
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Ordered Engrossed
- Re-ref Com On Local Government
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 05/16/2016
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Local Government
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 160A-279.5
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor