+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-60
- Ratified
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government I
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 160A-496
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor