+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
- Reptd Fav. For Introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 13, 2013: A1 Fisher Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Type:
Primary Sponsor