+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 27, 2016 in the House:
- Died on Table
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. Murphy): MA DV 152-145 03/10/2016 HJ 25 P. 112
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass HC 14 P. 87
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-3; RC) HC 14 P. 87
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 09:00 AM LOB 204
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 AM LOB 204
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 4 P. 20
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 11:00 AM LOB204