+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.14
- Signed Chap.473
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.541
- Substituted For A5548
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1525
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (4)
June 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
June 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor