+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.20
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.64
- Substituted For A372
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.15
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor