+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.19
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On January 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.15
- Substituted For A370
On January 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.11
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 17, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
January 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor