+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 967a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor