+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1407
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.913
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
June 18, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor