+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.509
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.51
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
February 12, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
May 23, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
January 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor