+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.223
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.258
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
March 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
March 2, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
February 13, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor