+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.352
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.285
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
February 24, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
February 8, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor