+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.176
On December 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.769
- Substituted For A5413a
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1918
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor