+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.396
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
February 22, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor