+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 942a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor