+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.216
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.586
- Substituted For A10440
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1616
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities 1
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
May 25, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor