+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 937a
- Amend And Recommit To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 12
March 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor