+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1316
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
May 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 1