+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.65
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.855
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (2)
January 8, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4