+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.475
On July 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.541
- Substituted For A7952
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1626
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
May 31, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor