+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.785
On December 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.766
- Substituted For A10522
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1870
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor