+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1382
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Education
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 15
June 5, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1