+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.348
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.651
- Substituted For A10472
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1699
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor