+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.471
On July 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.746
- Substituted For A10270
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1909
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor