+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 908c
- Amend and recommit to veterans, homeland security and military affairs
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 908b
- Amend (t) and recommit to veterans, homeland security and military affairs
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 908a
- Amend and recommit to veterans, homeland security and military affairs
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to veterans, homeland security and military affairs
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to veterans, homeland security and military affairs
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor