+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1322
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Internet And Technology
+ − Vote
May 11, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Internet And Technology)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor