+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.569
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.885
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (4)
May 4, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
April 11, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor