+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1347
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1